Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Werner Friese (until 2001-06-30) | 1946-03-30 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Christoph Daum (until 2000-10-21) | 1953-10-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Peter Hermann (until 2003-02-16) | 1952-03-22 | ||||
Roland Koch (until 2000-10-31) | 1952-10-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Rudiger Vollborn (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-02-12 | |||
23 | Dirk Heinen (until 1999-12-31) | 1970-12-03 | |||
31 | Lars Leese (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-08-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Markus Happe (until 1999-12-05) | 1972-02-11 | |||
4 | Christian Worns (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-05-10 | |||
5 | Jens Nowotny (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-01-11 | |||
19 | Jan Heintze (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-08-17 | |||
20 | Holger Fach (until 1996-08-20) | 1962-09-06 | |||
27 | Daniel Schumann (until 1997-06-30) | 1977-02-13 | |||
32 | Robert Kovac (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-04-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Mike Rietpietsch (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-03-26 | |||
8 | Rene Rydlewicz (until 1997-10-14) | 1973-07-18 | |||
8 | Bernd Schuster (until 1996-12-31) | 1959-12-22 | |||
13 | Jose Elias (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-09-25 | |||
15 | Mario Tolkmitt (until 1996-12-31) | 1970-10-30 | |||
17 | Hans-Peter Lehnhoff (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-07-12 | |||
18 | Claudio Reyna (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-07-20 | |||
21 | Andreas Neuendorf (until 1997-12-31) | 1975-02-09 | |||
22 | Manuel Cardoni (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-09-22 | |||
28 | Carsten Ramelow (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-03-20 | |||
30 | Niko Kovac (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-10-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Paulo Sergio (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-06-02 | |||
9 | Ulf Kirsten (until 2003-06-30) | 1965-12-04 | |||
11 | Erik Meijer (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-08-02 | |||
14 | Markus Feldhoff (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-08-29 | |||
24 | Sebastian Helbig (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-04-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1996-08-11 20:15 |
5 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |