Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Rober (until 2002-02-06) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Bernd Storck (until 2002-02-06) | 1963-01-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jens Adler (until 1997-06-30) | 1965-04-25 | ||||
1 | Christian Fiedler (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-03-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Carsten Kober (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-10-11 | ||||
6 | Eyjolfur Sverrisson (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-08-03 | |||
8 | Steffen Karl (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-02-03 | |||
15 | Hasan Vural (until 1997-12-31) | 1973-12-17 | |||
23 | Oliver Schmidt (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-09-14 | |||
27 | Gunnar Sauer (until 1997-06-30) | 1964-06-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Uwe Weidemann (from 1997-01-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-06-14 | ||||
Dirk Bremser (until 1997-06-30) | 1965-10-01 | ||||
Falko Gotz (until 1997-06-30) | 1962-03-26 | ||||
Thomas Richter (until 1996-10-15) | 1967-06-29 | ||||
14 | Ante Covic (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-08-31 | |||
16 | Sixten Veit (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-01-07 | |||
17 | Michel Mazingu-Dinzey (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-10-15 | |||
18 | Pal Dardai (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-03-16 | |||
19 | Andreas Schmidt (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-09-14 | |||
21 | Michael Hartmann (until 2005-01-30) | 1974-07-11 | |||
24 | Christian Fahrmann (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-10-05 | |||
25 | Marc Arnold (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-09-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Altin Rraklli (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-07-17 | ||||
11 | Michael Preetz (until 2003-06-30) | 1967-08-17 | |||
20 | Axel Kruse (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-09-27 | |||
26 | Marcel Rath (until 1997-12-31) | 1975-09-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1996-08-11 14:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1996-10-01 19:30 |
4 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |