Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Edmund Becker (until 2005-01-12) | 1956-07-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Simon Jentzsch (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-05-04 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dubravko Kolinger (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-11-29 | ||||
Tomislav Peric (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-11-13 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dominique Eller (until 2007-06-30) | 1976-07-14 | ||||
Martin Jung (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-09-11 | ||||
Thomas Ollhoff (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-06-15 | ||||
Christian Hurle (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-03-30 | ||||
Jochen Horner (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-05-18 | ||||
Kristian Sprecakovic (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-06-12 | ||||
Marc Burkart (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-08-09 | ||||
Rainer Baumgart (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-08-23 | ||||
Peter Jung (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-09-22 | ||||
Timo Haas (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-02-08 | ||||
Matthias Predojevic (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-11-14 | ||||
Engin Sungul (until 1997-06-30) | 1977-12-04 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Christian Seeberger (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-01-28 | ||||
Guido Streichsbier (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-10-21 | ||||
Igli Tare (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-07-25 | ||||
Mike Bodenstein (until 1997-06-30) | 1978-09-17 | ||||
Markus Stock (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-06-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1996-08-11 16:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1996-09-01 15:00 |
2 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1996-10-22 19:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |