Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Friedhelm Funkel (until 2000-03-19) | 1953-12-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Holger Gehrke (until 1998-06-30) | 1960-08-22 | |||
12 | Thomas Gill (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-05-16 | |||
28 | Thorsten Albustin (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-01-04 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Joachim Hopp (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-07-10 | |||
4 | Torsten Wohlert (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-12-10 | |||
5 | Alfred Nijhuis (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-03-23 | |||
6 | Oliver Westerbeek (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-02-08 | |||
13 | Markus Reiter (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-08-10 | |||
15 | Horst Steffen (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-03-03 | |||
22 | Stefan Emmerling (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-02-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Dietmar Hirsch (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-12-08 | |||
10 | Dirk Anders (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-09-26 | |||
14 | Miroslav Bicanic (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-10-29 | |||
16 | Marc Kienle (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-10-22 | |||
17 | Thomas Puschmann (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-03-28 | |||
20 | Michael Zeyer (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-06-09 | |||
21 | Thomas Vana (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-10-09 | |||
24 | Carsten Wolters (from 1996-09-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-07-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Tomislav Erceg (until 1996-12-31) | 1971-10-22 | ||||
8 | Markus Osthoff (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-11-19 | |||
9 | Bachirou Salou (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-09-15 | |||
11 | Marcus Marin (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-12-13 | |||
19 | Alexander Lobe (until 1996-11-20) | 1972-11-13 | |||
25 | Niklas Skoog (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-06-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1996-08-10 15:30 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1996-08-31 15:30 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1996-10-23 14:30 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |