Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Armin Veh (until 1997-10-14) | 1961-02-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Gunther Reichold (until 2003-06-30) | 1965-06-10 | |||
1 | Andreas Menger (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-09-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Rainer Zietsch (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-11-21 | ||||
Muhamed Preljevic (until 1997-12-31) | 1964-06-16 | ||||
Michael Hecht (until 1997-06-30) | 1965-04-27 | ||||
Frank Schmidt (until 1996-12-31) | 1974-01-03 | ||||
2 | Dieter Probst (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-02-04 | |||
3 | Janos Radoki (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-03-07 | |||
14 | Domenico Sbordone (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-09-03 | |||
21 | Thomas Richter (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-11-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Godfried Aduobe (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-10-29 | ||||
Almin Osmanagic (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-02-08 | ||||
Roland Stein (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-01-19 | ||||
Bernd Muller (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-04-25 | ||||
5 | Markus Lotter (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-09-28 | |||
8 | Jochen Weigl (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-04-21 | |||
17 | Thomas Motzke (until 1997-12-31) | 1968-05-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Alexander Durr (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-02-04 | ||||
Nikola Juricic (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-08-05 | ||||
Harald Ebner (until 1997-06-30) | 1964-09-15 | ||||
Heinrich Dumpert (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-04-26 | ||||
9 | Frank Turr (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-09-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1996-08-10 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1996-08-31 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1996-10-23 19:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |