Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Wolf (until 1998-02-18) | 1957-09-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Thomas Walter (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-03-03 | |||
25 | Bernd Klaus (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-02-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Dirk Wullbier (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-07-29 | |||
4 | Ralf Strogies (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-09-18 | |||
12 | Michail Smirnow (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-08-10 | |||
15 | Achim Pfuderer (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-11-29 | |||
18 | Jochen Novodomsky (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-04-04 | |||
19 | Alexander Malchow (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-09-11 | |||
26 | Ivica Smid (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-03-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tobias Hagele (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-02-02 | ||||
3 | Stefan Minkwitz (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-06-01 | |||
5 | Markus Losch (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-09-26 | |||
7 | Robert Hofacker (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-12-22 | |||
10 | Adnan Kevric (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-05-02 | |||
11 | Janusz Gora (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-07-08 | |||
13 | Niko Chatzis (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-05-02 | |||
16 | Zoltan Sebescen (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-10-01 | |||
17 | Torsten Raspe (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-08-01 | |||
18 | Ralf Becker (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-09-26 | |||
20 | Andre Sirocks (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-09-18 | |||
21 | Osman Per (until 1997-05-11) | 1973-06-20 | |||
24 | Niclas Nyhlen (until 1996-12-31) | 1966-03-21 | |||
26 | Jago Maric (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-02-03 | |||
27 | Stefan Kleyer (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-12-19 | |||
28 | Bernd Santl (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-01-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
6 | Antun Labak (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-07-14 | |||
8 | Markus Sailer (until 1999-12-31) | 1968-04-26 | |||
9 | Markus Beierle (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-06-02 | |||
14 | Tomislav Maric (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-01-28 | |||
23 | Marcus Schneck (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-08-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1996-08-11 15:00 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |