Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Paul Linz (until 1997-12-16) | 1956-01-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Stefan Hulswitt (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-08-13 | ||||
Stefan Brasas (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-08-31 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Prus (from 1996-09-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-02-04 | ||||
Andreas Helmer (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-02-25 | ||||
Thomas Kluge (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-06-16 | ||||
5 | Bernd Deters (until 2000-06-30) | 1961-08-18 | |||
22 | Eckhard Vorholt (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-10-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Manfred Schulte (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-09-26 | ||||
Holger Wehlage (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-07-03 | ||||
Markus von Ahlen (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-01-01 | ||||
Carsten Marell (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-09-08 | ||||
Bernd Winter (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-07-24 | ||||
Thomas Bottche (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-02-14 | ||||
Lamine Conteh (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-01-17 | ||||
Zbigniew Szewczyk (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-11-29 | ||||
Alexej Kupzow (until 1997-06-30) | 1977-09-02 | ||||
10 | Marko Myyry (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-11-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Damir Bujan (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-03-29 | ||||
Robert Thoben (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-11-17 | ||||
Christian Claassen (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-05-22 | ||||
Alexander Ukrow (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-12-07 | ||||
Mario Lau (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-08-06 | ||||
Karsten Imort (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-07-07 | ||||
Josef Menke (until 1997-06-30) | 1959-09-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1996-08-11 15:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1996-08-31 15:30 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1996-10-22 19:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |