Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Rapolder (from 1997-03-29) (until 2001-11-12) | 1958-05-29 | ||||
Klaus Schlappner (until 1997-10-09) | 1940-05-22 | ||||
Gunter Sebert (from 1996-10-10) (until 1997-03-28) | 1948-05-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Eugen Hach (until 1999-06-30) | 1960-09-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Marco Langner (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-05-08 | ||||
Andreas Clauss (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-01-13 | ||||
Thorsten Muller (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-07-07 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Maik Unfricht (from 1997-01-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1979-11-13 | ||||
Dennis Mackert (until 1998-12-31) | 1977-04-03 | ||||
Waldemar Ksienzyk (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-11-08 | ||||
Frank Schon (from 1997-02-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-01-15 | ||||
Jens Gerlach (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-07-03 | ||||
Enrico Barth (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-10-06 | ||||
Patrick Klyk (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-10-01 | ||||
Frank Scheuber (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-10-21 | ||||
Andreas Wagenhaus (until 1996-12-31) | 1964-10-29 | ||||
Michael Kopper (until 1996-10-31) | 1966-11-17 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andrzej Kobylanski (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-07-31 | ||||
Mirko Reichel (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-12-02 | ||||
Norbert Hofmann (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-01-01 | ||||
Jurgen Luginger (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-12-08 | ||||
Fabrizio Hayer (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-05-11 | ||||
Niels Schlotterbeck (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-03-12 | ||||
Thomas Richter (from 1996-10-16) (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-06-29 | ||||
Alois Schwartz (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-03-28 | ||||
Matthias Dehoust (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-12-14 | ||||
Mallam Yahaya (from 1997-01-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-12-31 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Atilla Birlik (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-11-27 | ||||
Thomas Epp (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-04-07 | ||||
Uwe Hartenberger (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-02-01 | ||||
Soner Uysal (until 1997-06-30) | 1977-08-24 | ||||
Bjarki Gunnlaugsson (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-03-06 | ||||
Frederick Commodore (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-08-07 | ||||
Georgios Karagiannis (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-09-16 | ||||
Marek Czakon (until 1996-12-31) | 1963-12-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1996-08-11 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1996-10-01 19:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |