Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bruno Hubner (until 1997-06-30) | 1961-01-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Rudolf Collet (until 2000-06-30) | 1958-08-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Steffen Vogler (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-06-17 | ||||
Manfred Petz (until 1997-06-30) | 1961-05-05 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Alp Dalkilic (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-11-30 | ||||
Mounir Zitouni (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-09-15 | ||||
Michael Muller (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-04-04 | ||||
Claus Junginger (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-09-15 | ||||
3 | Frank Wilde (until 2006-06-30) | 1975-03-26 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Richard Walz (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-08-24 | ||||
Michael Sauer (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-09-07 | ||||
Thomas Zampach (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-12-27 | ||||
Tom Stohn (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-12-21 | ||||
Guido Schafer (from 1997-01-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1964-09-14 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Nazir Saridogan (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-11-11 | ||||
Bernhard Raab (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-03-17 | ||||
Jan-Michael Marggraf (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-03-10 | ||||
Thorsten Ott (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-06-18 | ||||
Michael Ott (until 1997-12-31) | 1971-12-17 | ||||
Thomas Reichenberger (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-10-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1996-08-11 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |