Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hubert Huring (until 1997-06-30) | 1950-05-27 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Krzysztof Zajac (until 2000-06-30) | 1958-02-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Eilenberger (until 1999-12-31) | 1965-11-16 | ||||
Hans Jorg Butt (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-05-28 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Wieslaw Cisek (until 2001-06-30) | 1963-01-02 | ||||
Jorg-Uwe Klutz (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-07-27 | ||||
Maciej Janiak (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-08-16 | ||||
Arne Tammen (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-01-29 | ||||
Lasse Sall (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-04-19 | ||||
Jan Sievers (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-08-19 | ||||
Goran Milosavljevic (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-04-11 | ||||
Frank Claassen (until 1996-12-31) | 1967-11-08 | ||||
5 | Andrew Uwe (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-10-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andreas Boll (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-08-06 | ||||
Alexander Woloschin (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-04-04 | ||||
Mirko Votava (from 1996-12-09) (until 1998-06-30) | 1956-04-25 | ||||
Carsten Cordes (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-09-19 | ||||
Timo Ehle (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-11-02 | ||||
Thomas Goch (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-10-04 | ||||
Dariusz Szubert (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-10-31 | ||||
Sven Bremer (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-06-02 | ||||
Ralf Hilljegerdes (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-12-12 | ||||
Stefan Lang (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-08-29 | ||||
Sandi Valentincic (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-08-25 | ||||
Patrick Zierott (until 1996-12-31) | 1966-06-25 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Collins Etebu (until 1999-12-31) | 1970-04-22 | ||||
Horst Elberfeld (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-09-18 | ||||
Jan Urban (until 1997-06-30) | 1962-05-14 | ||||
Jacek Janiak (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-01-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1996-08-11 15:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1996-09-17 17:15 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |