Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Willi Reimann (until 1998-03-17) | 1949-12-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Uwe Zimmermann (until 1999-06-30) | 1962-02-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Matthias Maucksch (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-06-11 | ||||
Oliver Luttkenhaus (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-06-28 | ||||
Ulf-Volker Probst (until 1997-06-30) | 1964-10-03 | ||||
4 | Jann Jensen (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-02-22 | |||
5 | Zoran Tomcic (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-02-26 | |||
6 | Jens Keller (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-11-24 | |||
8 | Holger Ballwanz (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-09-07 | |||
15 | Peter Kleeschatzky (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-06-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Butrej (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-06-26 | ||||
2 | Markus Kullig (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-11-04 | |||
3 | Matthias Stammann (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-05-08 | |||
10 | Chad Deering (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-09-02 | |||
17 | Sven Ratke (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-01-03 | |||
18 | Detlev Dammeier (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | |||
20 | Sead Kapetanovic (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-01-21 | |||
21 | Michael Spies (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-07-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Petar Michtarski (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-07-15 | ||||
7 | Roy Prager (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-09-22 | |||
9 | Piotr Tyszkiewicz (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-09-04 | |||
11 | Stefan Meissner (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-03-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1996-08-11 15:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1996-08-31 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |