Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Stefan Majewski (until 1999-06-30) | 1956-01-31 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Thorsten Reiss (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-08-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Thomas Antes (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-10-08 | ||||
Mirko Bitzer (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-04-05 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Sven Neumann (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-08-10 | ||||
Sascha Hildmann (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-04-07 | ||||
Roger Lutz (until 1999-06-30) | 1964-07-15 | ||||
Rudiger Ziehl (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-10-26 | ||||
Peter Kobel (until 1997-12-31) | 1969-06-09 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Berndt (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-12-14 | ||||
Tobias Weis (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-11-18 | ||||
Daniel Graf (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-08-03 | ||||
Jorg Grubert (until 1998-06-30) | 1978-05-23 | ||||
Stefan Caporaso (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-12-26 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Bjorn Kriegshauser (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-10-07 | ||||
Brandon Fonseca (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-10-13 | ||||
Daniel Huss (from 1998-01-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1979-10-04 | ||||
Mahir Sahin (until 1998-06-30) | 1979-11-01 | ||||
Frank Weber (until 1997-12-31) | 1968-02-23 | ||||
Sascha Koch (until 1997-08-31) | 1978-03-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1997-08-16 15:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |