Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dirk Karkuth (until 1998-09-15) | 1962-01-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Denis Gilgemann (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-11-10 | ||||
Georg Muller (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-04-15 | ||||
12 | Harald Ebertz (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-05-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Matthias Sellmann (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-01-16 | ||||
Patrick Klyk (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-10-01 | ||||
Joachim Trautmann (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-08-16 | ||||
Peter Eiden (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-08-31 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jean-Philippe Sechet (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-07-15 | ||||
Franz Weber (until 1999-12-31) | 1965-05-25 | ||||
Paolo da Palma (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-03-18 | ||||
Juan Carlos Corvalan (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-03-28 | ||||
Dario Brose (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-01-27 | ||||
Jurgen Luginger (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-12-08 | ||||
Janne Lindberg (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-05-24 | ||||
Alexander Leibrock (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-06-21 | ||||
Kai-Uwe Schnell (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-12-14 | ||||
Mario Nickeleit (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-09-30 | ||||
Patrick Amrane (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-12-25 | ||||
Yaw Ohemeng (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-10-01 | ||||
26 | Stephen Musa (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-09-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Branko Zibert (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-07-14 | ||||
Angelo Donato (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-02-06 | ||||
Markus Wuckel (until 1997-12-31) | 1967-04-05 | ||||
8 | Sambo Choji (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-03-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1997-08-15 19:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1997-09-24 19:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |