Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Frank (from 1998-04-09) (until 2000-04-17) | 1951-02-21 | ||||
Dietmar Constantini (from 1997-09-17) (until 1998-04-08) | 1955-05-30 | ||||
Manfred Lorenz (from 1997-08-26) (until 1997-09-16) | 1948-08-26 | ||||
Reinhard Saftig (until 1997-08-25) | 1952-01-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Stephan Kuhnert (until 1999-06-30) | 1960-09-07 | ||||
1 | Dimo Wache (until 2010-06-30) | 1973-11-01 | |||
23 | Holger Bernhardt (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-11-24 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Dennis Probst (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-10-11 | ||||
Helmut Gabriel (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-10-03 | ||||
Christian Bauer (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-08-06 | ||||
3 | Uwe Stover (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-02-08 | |||
4 | Jurgen Klopp (until 2001-02-27) | 1967-06-16 | |||
5 | Peter Neustadter (until 2004-12-31) | 1966-02-16 | |||
21 | Miroslav Tanjga (until 1999-06-30) | 1964-07-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Roland Nagy (from 1997-11-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-06-12 | ||||
Aurel Panait (from 1997-12-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-08-27 | ||||
Markus Kreuz (until 1997-11-30) | 1977-04-29 | ||||
Abderrahim Ouakili (until 1997-11-30) | 1970-12-12 | ||||
6 | Lars Schmidt (until 1999-06-30) | 1965-09-13 | |||
8 | Torsten Lieberknecht (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-08-01 | |||
11 | Christian Hock (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-04-11 | |||
12 | Steffen Herzberger (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-09-21 | |||
13 | Florian Sohler (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-04-15 | |||
14 | Jurgen Kramny (until 2005-06-30) | 1971-10-18 | |||
15 | Adrian Spyrka (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-08-01 | |||
18 | Fabrizio Hayer (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-05-11 | |||
24 | Sandro Schwarz (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-10-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Sebastian Barnes (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-11-18 | ||||
Luiz Antonio (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-11-30 | ||||
7 | Sven Demandt (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-02-13 | |||
9 | Marco Grevelhorster (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-04-26 | |||
10 | Jacques Goumai (from 1998-01-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-04-17 | |||
16 | Stipan Jakic (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-05-03 | |||
20 | Guido Erhard (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-10-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1997-08-16 15:30 |
6 : 7 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1997-09-24 19:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |