Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Harry Rath (until 1999-03-30) | 1956-02-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Kai Hillmann (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-10-11 | ||||
Robert Reschke (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-10-23 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Olaf Backasch (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-10-04 | ||||
Thomas Schwobel (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-07-28 | ||||
Jorg Weber (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-11-21 | ||||
Sascha Geister (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-11-07 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Badri Danelia (until 2003-06-30) | 1967-01-02 | ||||
Jorg Bartz (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-06-19 | ||||
Ulf Wiemer (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-11-03 | ||||
Bjorn Kremser (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-03-02 | ||||
Mike Klenge (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-08-18 | ||||
Maik Schulz (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-01-10 | ||||
Laszlo Takacs (until 1998-02-28) | 1976-10-19 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Frank Bartz (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-06-19 | ||||
Silvio Schade (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-12-16 | ||||
Dennis Mielke (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-07-12 | ||||
Andy Wagner (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-10-30 | ||||
Boniface Okafor (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-01-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1997-08-16 15:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |