Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hannes Linssen (until 1998-09-07) | 1949-09-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Adam Matysek (until 1998-08-05) | 1968-09-01 | |||
25 | Dirk Langerbein (until 1999-08-31) | 1971-09-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Josip Rasic (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-10-12 | ||||
3 | Rob Reekers (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-05-07 | |||
4 | Dirk Konerding (until 2005-06-30) | 1969-02-27 | |||
5 | Jens Tschiedel (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-08-05 | |||
8 | Christian Meyer (until 1999-12-31) | 1968-12-24 | |||
11 | Willi Landgraf (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-08-29 | |||
12 | Marian Hodulik (until 1999-06-30) | 1979-11-26 | |||
13 | Janosch Dziwior (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-09-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andreas Ellguth (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-08-28 | ||||
Sven Bremer (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-06-02 | ||||
Ruslan Romantschuk (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-10-12 | ||||
6 | Dirk Flock (until 1998-08-18) | 1972-05-23 | |||
10 | Uwe Weidemann (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-06-14 | |||
14 | Wojchiech Choroba (until 1999-08-31) | 1966-05-03 | |||
16 | Frank Scharpenberg (until 1999-12-31) | 1971-11-30 | |||
17 | Ralf Lewe (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-05-13 | |||
23 | Mike Schurmann (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-08-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Alexander Lobe (until 1998-12-31) | 1972-11-13 | ||||
Angelo Vier (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-04-23 | ||||
Vlado Papic (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-09-21 | ||||
Soner Uysal (from 1998-01-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-08-24 | ||||
20 | David Wagner (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-10-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1997-08-14 18:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |