Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerhard Kleppinger (from 1997-11-28) (until 1999-01-31) | 1958-03-01 | ||||
Eckhard Krautzun (until 1997-11-27) | 1941-01-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Klaus Thomforde (until 2000-06-30) | 1962-12-01 | |||
23 | Carsten Wehlmann (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-06-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Andre Trulsen (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-05-28 | |||
4 | Karl Werner (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-07-21 | |||
8 | Stephan Hanke (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-10-19 | |||
14 | Omer Erdogan (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-05-03 | |||
21 | Holger Stanislawski (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-09-26 | |||
26 | Torsten Chmielewski (from 1997-10-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-01-21 | |||
30 | Piotr Staczek (until 1998-06-30) | 1978-09-13 | |||
33 | Markus Ahlf (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-11-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Christian Rahn (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-06-15 | |||
5 | Dirk Dammann (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-08-14 | |||
6 | Daniel Franco (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-08-26 | |||
10 | Carsten Propper (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-10-20 | |||
12 | Kaliph Sidibe (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-03-25 | |||
15 | Christian Springer (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-07-15 | |||
16 | Thomas Meggle (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-02-22 | |||
20 | Thomas Seeliger (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-09-20 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Michael Mason (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-06-28 | |||
9 | Marcus Marin (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-12-13 | |||
11 | Juri Sawitschew (until 1999-06-30) | 1965-02-19 | |||
13 | Jens Scharping (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-07-16 | |||
17 | Ivan Klasnic (from 1998-01-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-01-29 | |||
17 | Jacques Goumai (until 1997-12-31) | 1972-04-17 | |||
18 | Cem Karaca (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-05-08 | |||
19 | Kai Dittmer (until 1998-12-31) | 1974-10-31 | |||
25 | Matthias Scherz (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-12-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1997-08-14 19:30 |
4 : 2 PSO |
Schema Compare |