Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Rober (until 2002-02-06) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Bernd Storck (until 2002-02-06) | 1963-01-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Christian Fiedler (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-03-27 | |||
12 | Gabor Kiraly (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-04-01 | |||
28 | Thorsten Malessa (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-09-03 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Hendrik Herzog (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-04-02 | |||
4 | Dick van Burik (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-11-29 | |||
6 | Eyjolfur Sverrisson (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-08-03 | |||
8 | Steffen Karl (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-02-03 | |||
15 | Hasan Vural (until 1997-12-31) | 1973-12-17 | |||
23 | Oliver Schmidt (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-09-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Sergej Mandreko (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-08-01 | |||
10 | Kjetil Rekdal (until 2000-03-13) | 1968-11-06 | |||
14 | Ante Covic (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-08-31 | |||
16 | Sixten Veit (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-01-07 | |||
17 | Michel Mazingu-Dinzey (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-10-15 | |||
18 | Pal Dardai (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-03-16 | |||
19 | Andreas Schmidt (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-09-14 | |||
21 | Michael Hartmann (until 2005-01-30) | 1974-07-11 | |||
24 | Christian Fahrmann (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-10-05 | |||
25 | Marc Arnold (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-09-19 | |||
26 | Andreas Neuendorf (from 1998-01-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-02-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Bryan Roy (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-02-12 | |||
11 | Michael Preetz (until 2003-06-30) | 1967-08-17 | |||
13 | Alphonse Tchami (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-09-14 | |||
20 | Axel Kruse (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-09-27 | |||
22 | Carsten Lakies (until 1998-12-31) | 1971-01-08 | |||
26 | Marcel Rath (until 1997-12-31) | 1975-09-03 | |||
27 | Andreas Thom (from 1997-08-31) (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-09-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1997-08-16 15:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1997-09-24 19:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |