Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerd vom Bruch (until 1998-10-04) | 1941-08-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oliver Adler (until 2005-06-30) | 1967-10-14 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jiannis Giaslanis (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-12-25 | ||||
3 | Bjorn Arens (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-09-29 | |||
4 | Ivan Konjevic (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-02-09 | |||
5 | Daniel Ciuca (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-06-01 | |||
22 | Peter Quallo (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-10-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dennis Weiland (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-08-30 | ||||
Carsten Marquardt (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-06-02 | ||||
Arne Hoffart (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-12-06 | ||||
Frank Roth (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-09-17 | ||||
Martin Tilner (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-02-01 | ||||
6 | Siegmar Bieber (until 1999-10-14) | 1968-01-04 | |||
8 | Jorg Lipinski (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-10-31 | |||
15 | Teo Rus (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-04-30 | |||
18 | Gerd Kuhn (from 1998-01-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-03-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Michael Jide Olugbodi (until 1999-12-31) | 1977-11-29 | ||||
Olumide Agoye (until 1998-12-31) | 1976-01-19 | ||||
Gustav Policella (from 1998-01-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-09-14 | ||||
Niclas Weiland (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-07-22 | ||||
Tino Milde (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-06-22 | ||||
7 | Achim Weber (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-03-11 | |||
17 | Jorg Beyel (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-10-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1997-08-14 19:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |