Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Volker Finke (until 2007-06-30) | 1948-03-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Karsten Neitzel (until 2007-06-30) | 1967-12-17 | ||||
Achim Sarstedt (until 2007-06-30) | 1959-10-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Bosko Boskovic (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-01-12 | |||
23 | Dietmar Hummel (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-10-20 | |||
24 | Timo Reus (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-05-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Frontzeck (until 1999-01-19) | 1964-03-26 | ||||
Thomas Herz (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-02-10 | ||||
2 | Daniel Schumann (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-02-13 | |||
4 | Torben Hoffmann (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-10-27 | |||
5 | Jorn Schwinkendorf (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-01-27 | |||
6 | Steffen Korell (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-10-27 | |||
13 | Stefan Muller (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-03-08 | |||
17 | Boubacar Diarra (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-07-15 | |||
20 | Damir Buric (until 1999-06-30) | 1964-07-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Zoubaier Baya (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-05-15 | |||
10 | Lewan Kobiaschwili (from 1998-01-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-07-10 | |||
11 | Marco Weisshaupt (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-06-24 | |||
12 | Ralf Kohl (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-10-28 | |||
14 | Miran Pavlin (until 1999-08-31) | 1971-10-08 | |||
19 | Andreas Bornemann (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-09-15 | |||
28 | Marouene Guezmir (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-03-06 | |||
30 | Ali Gunes (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-11-23 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Marco Buchheit (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-01-12 | ||||
9 | Alexander Iaschwili (from 1997-10-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-10-23 | |||
18 | Mehdi Ben Slimane (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-01-05 | |||
22 | Uwe Wassmer (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-01-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1997-08-15 19:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |