Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Franz-Josef Tenhagen (until 1998-09-13) | 1952-10-31 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Christian Maly (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-01-20 | ||||
1 | Peter Martin (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-12-21 | |||
23 | Christoph Jacob (until 1998-06-30) | 1978-02-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Martin Klinge (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-08-26 | ||||
2 | Frank Blaker (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-11-15 | |||
3 | Hilko Ristau (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-04-24 | |||
4 | Andreas Teichmann (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-06-04 | |||
5 | Mirko Stark (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-09-28 | |||
6 | Stefan Fengler (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-04-02 | |||
18 | Frank Schon (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-01-15 | |||
21 | Stefan Blank (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-03-10 | |||
22 | Olaf Skok (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-07-31 | |||
24 | Arthur Matlik (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-09-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Werner Kempkens (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-11-03 | |||
10 | Frank Sus (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-12-04 | |||
13 | Stefan Majek (until 1998-12-31) | 1970-04-15 | |||
14 | Sergej Korobka (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-02-13 | |||
14 | Emil Hamar (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-03-20 | |||
15 | Andre Gumprecht (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-12-26 | |||
16 | Rainer Schumann (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-10-01 | |||
17 | Marcus Hasecke (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-10-29 | |||
19 | Gudni Helgason (from 1997-10-16) (until 1998-06-05) | 1976-07-16 | |||
20 | Cetin Aydin (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-06-10 | |||
30 | Thorsten Schmugge (from 1997-12-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-10-13 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Sergio Allievi (until 2000-06-30) | 1964-01-17 | |||
9 | Serhij Dichtjar (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-08-26 | |||
11 | Marcus Feinbier (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-11-30 | |||
25 | Souleyman Sane (until 1999-06-30) | 1961-02-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1997-08-14 19:30 |
4 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |