Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Willi Entenmann (from 1997-10-02) (until 1998-06-30) | 1943-09-25 | ||||
Lorenz-Gunther Kostner (until 1997-10-01) | 1952-01-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Harry Deutinger (until 2004-04-01) | 1947-02-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jurgen Wittmann (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-08-14 | |||
22 | Udo Mai (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-07-29 | |||
27 | Peter Sirch (until 2002-06-30) | 1961-12-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Carsten Keuler (from 1998-01-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-08-30 | ||||
Tobias Hager (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-08-13 | ||||
2 | Alexander Strehmel (until 2004-01-21) | 1968-03-20 | |||
4 | Ralf Bucher (until 2009-06-30) | 1972-04-06 | |||
6 | Jorg Bergen (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-06-27 | |||
15 | Arne Tammen (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-01-29 | |||
21 | Bjorn Hertl (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-08-10 | |||
24 | Ivica Vladimir (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-01-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Matthias Lust (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-04-27 | ||||
Stephan Tauber (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-10-08 | ||||
Matthew Okoh (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-05-19 | ||||
Thomas Radlspeck (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-11-16 | ||||
Stefan Reich (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-02-02 | ||||
Reto Buchner (until 1998-06-30) | 1979-01-13 | ||||
Albert Grober (until 1997-12-31) | 1967-04-26 | ||||
5 | Matthias Zimmermann (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-09-14 | |||
7 | Dirk Hofmann (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-06-06 | |||
8 | Peter Zeiler (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-10-08 | |||
10 | Markus Oberleitner (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-08-16 | |||
11 | Jochen Seitz (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-10-11 | |||
16 | Andreas Hartig (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-10-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Abdelaziz Ahanfouf (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-01-14 | ||||
Skerdilaid Curri (from 1998-01-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-10-06 | ||||
9 | Altin Rraklli (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-07-17 | |||
14 | Alfonso Garcia (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-10-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1997-08-16 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |