Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Rangnick (until 1999-03-16) | 1958-06-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Dr. Philipp Laux (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-01-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Tuchel (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-08-29 | ||||
2 | Marco Konrad (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-10-18 | |||
3 | Frank Kinkel (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-12-20 | |||
4 | Joachim Stadler (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-01-15 | |||
5 | Rainer Widmayer (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-04-02 | |||
8 | Tamas Bodog (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-09-27 | |||
15 | Oliver Unsold (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-10-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Christos Papadopoulos (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-11-26 | ||||
Matthias Fritz (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-11-29 | ||||
Grozdan Tokic (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-03-15 | ||||
6 | Oliver Otto (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-11-21 | |||
7 | Markus Pleuler (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-05-10 | |||
10 | Janusz Gora (until 2001-06-30) | 1963-07-08 | |||
14 | Dragan Buterin (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-10-25 | |||
19 | Bernd Maier (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-11-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Nico Frommer (until 1998-06-30) | 1978-04-08 | ||||
Roland Regenbogen (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-08-27 | ||||
Hans-Jorg Honold (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-06-18 | ||||
9 | Fritz Walter (until 1999-06-30) | 1960-07-21 | |||
11 | Dragan Trkulja (until 2002-06-30) | 1964-09-30 | |||
20 | Sascha Rosler (until 2001-06-30) | 1977-10-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1997-08-15 18:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1997-09-24 19:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1997-12-02 20:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |