Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Paul Linz (from 1998-02-25) (until 1999-05-17) | 1956-01-04 | ||||
Frieder Schomezler (from 1998-02-19) (until 1998-02-24) | 1952-02-09 | ||||
Wolfgang Wolf (until 1998-02-18) | 1957-09-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Thomas Walter (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-03-03 | |||
25 | Bernd Klaus (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-02-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Dirk Wullbier (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-07-29 | |||
4 | Ralf Strogies (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-09-18 | |||
15 | Achim Pfuderer (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-11-29 | |||
19 | Alexander Malchow (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-09-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Stefan Minkwitz (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-06-01 | |||
5 | Markus Losch (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-09-26 | |||
7 | Robert Hofacker (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-12-22 | |||
10 | Adnan Kevric (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-05-02 | |||
12 | Patrick Glockner (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-11-18 | |||
13 | Niko Chatzis (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-05-02 | |||
16 | Zoltan Sebescen (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-10-01 | |||
17 | Torsten Raspe (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-08-01 | |||
18 | Ralf Becker (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-09-26 | |||
20 | Andre Sirocks (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-09-18 | |||
22 | Cristian Fiel (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-03-12 | |||
22 | Mourad Bounoua (until 1998-12-31) | 1972-07-30 | |||
24 | Mallam Yahaya (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-12-31 | |||
26 | Jago Maric (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-02-03 | |||
28 | Bernd Santl (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-01-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Markus Sailer (until 1999-12-31) | 1968-04-26 | |||
9 | Markus Beierle (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-06-02 | |||
11 | Eberhard Carl (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-05-13 | |||
14 | Tomislav Maric (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-01-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1997-08-16 15:30 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1997-09-24 19:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |