Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Schaaf (until 1999-05-09) | 1961-04-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jens Jaschob (until 1998-12-31) | 1968-01-19 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Matthias Plump (until 1999-12-31) | 1978-11-30 | ||||
Jens Lellek (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-01-31 | ||||
Gunter Brandstatter (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-07-29 | ||||
Kai Achilles (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-09-18 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Paul Stalteri (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-10-18 | ||||
Uwe Harttgen (until 1999-12-31) | 1964-07-06 | ||||
Christoph Dabrowski (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-07-01 | ||||
Thomas Penshorn (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-08-27 | ||||
Mike Barten (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-11-20 | ||||
Marco Hegerfeld (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-04-07 | ||||
Dieter Frey (until 1997-12-31) | 1972-10-31 | ||||
Hendrik Volzke (until 1997-12-31) | 1975-03-22 | ||||
16 | Danny Futterer (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-08-28 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Frank Kiesel (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-08-26 | ||||
Antoine Mbassa-Kone (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-01-16 | ||||
Stefan Borchardt (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-03-06 | ||||
Soren Seidel (until 1997-12-31) | 1972-10-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1997-08-16 15:30 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |