Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Charly Korbel (until 1997-10-14) | 1954-12-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Frank Bose (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-02-14 | ||||
Maik Wilde (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-08-14 | ||||
Thomas Richter (until 1998-06-30) | 1962-02-27 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Romas Mazeikis (until 2000-06-30) | 1964-04-28 | ||||
Sven Tramm (until 1999-12-31) | 1978-10-02 | ||||
Michael Kopper (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-11-17 | ||||
Holger Behnert (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-10-31 | ||||
Torsten Frohling (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-08-24 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dirk Bremser (until 1999-06-30) | 1965-10-01 | ||||
Oliver Schweissing (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-03-03 | ||||
Andre Golke (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-08-15 | ||||
Michael Koch (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-09-27 | ||||
Stefan Siedschlag (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-06-08 | ||||
Felix van der Steen (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-04-02 | ||||
Christoph Chylla (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-05-06 | ||||
Michael Butrej (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-06-26 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Stefan Studtrucker (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-11-25 | ||||
Lutz Schwerinski (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-02-18 | ||||
Jens Paeslack (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-02-25 | ||||
Marian Pagels (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-08-28 | ||||
Gustav Policella (until 1997-12-31) | 1975-09-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1997-08-16 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1997-09-25 16:45 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |