Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Mirko Votava (until 1998-06-30) | 1956-04-25 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Krzysztof Zajac (until 2000-06-30) | 1958-02-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Eilenberger (until 1999-12-31) | 1965-11-16 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Wieslaw Cisek (until 2001-06-30) | 1963-01-02 | ||||
Marco Grote (until 1999-12-31) | 1972-10-11 | ||||
Jorg-Uwe Klutz (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-07-27 | ||||
Maciej Janiak (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-08-16 | ||||
5 | Andrew Uwe (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-10-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hendrik Volzke (from 1998-01-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-03-22 | ||||
Andreas Boll (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-08-06 | ||||
Alexander Woloschin (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-04-04 | ||||
Michael Hennig (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-06-04 | ||||
Mirko Votava (until 1998-06-30) | 1956-04-25 | ||||
Carsten Cordes (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-09-19 | ||||
Timo Ehle (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-11-02 | ||||
Thomas Goch (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-10-04 | ||||
Carsten Herrmann (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-12-06 | ||||
Pavel Vandas (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-04-08 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Collins Etebu (until 1999-12-31) | 1970-04-22 | ||||
Frank Ordenewitz (until 1999-06-30) | 1965-03-25 | ||||
Stefan Meyer (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-04-30 | ||||
Horst Elberfeld (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-09-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1997-08-16 15:30 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |