Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rudi Bommer (until 1998-04-30) | 1957-08-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Michael Hock (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-06-09 | ||||
Dieter Heimen (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-03-07 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Andreas Fellhauer (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-09-16 | ||||
Ralf Ebner (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-12-02 | ||||
Reinhold Konig (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-08-07 | ||||
Matthias Hohmann (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-02-11 | ||||
Jurgen Strube (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-07-25 | ||||
Torsten Chmielewski (until 1997-09-30) | 1968-01-21 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jurgen Scherdel (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-06-04 | ||||
Frank Stier (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-06-09 | ||||
Roman Hanus (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-06-07 | ||||
Tobias Schachter (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-10-13 | ||||
Michael Sommer (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-12-19 | ||||
Klaus Perfetto (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-09-13 | ||||
Sven Henning (until 1998-06-30) | |||||
Sturm | |||||
Christoph Teinert (until 1998-06-30) | 1980-01-30 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Lutz (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-03-08 | ||||
David Behlil (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-06-08 | ||||
Frederick Commodore (from 1998-01-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-08-07 | ||||
Zeljko Dakic (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-06-27 | ||||
Haris Karamehmedovic (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-04-17 | ||||
Marc Volke (until 1997-12-31) | 1968-03-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1997-08-15 19:30 |
6 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1997-09-23 19:00 |
3 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |