Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Walter Junghans (until 1999-06-30) | 1958-10-26 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Schuster (until 1999-06-30) | 1959-12-22 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Colin Bell (until 1999-03-30) | 1961-08-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Markus Proll (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-08-28 | |||
1 | Andreas Menger (until 1998-12-31) | 1972-09-11 | |||
16 | Sebastian Selke (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-02-22 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Carsten Cullmann (until 2007-06-30) | 1976-03-05 | |||
4 | Dennis Grassow (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-10-10 | |||
5 | Spasoje Bulajic (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-11-24 | |||
6 | Dirk Schuster (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-12-29 | |||
20 | Thomas Cichon (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-07-09 | |||
26 | Alexander Voigt (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-04-13 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Claudio Marasa (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-10-01 | ||||
2 | Markus Bahr (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-09-10 | |||
3 | Karsten Hutwelker (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-08-27 | |||
7 | Ralf Hauptmann (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-09-20 | |||
8 | Dorinel Munteanu (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-06-25 | |||
10 | Claus-Dieter Wollitz (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-07-19 | |||
10 | Goran Vucevic (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-05-18 | |||
15 | Christian Springer (until 2006-06-30) | 1971-07-15 | |||
24 | Michael Rosele (until 2000-09-30) | 1974-10-07 | |||
30 | Dirk Lottner (from 1998-11-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-03-04 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Georgi Donkow (until 2002-03-29) | 1970-06-02 | |||
11 | Khodadad Azizi (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-06-22 | |||
13 | Holger Gaissmayer (until 1998-11-30) | 1970-07-02 | |||
14 | Luciano Emilio (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-12-12 | |||
17 | Ralph Hasenhuttl (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-08-09 | |||
22 | Stephan Glaser (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-03-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1998-08-29 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |