Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans-Dieter Schmidt (until 1999-06-30) | 1948-01-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Martin Hoffmann (until 1999-06-30) | 1955-03-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Mark Mewes (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-12-13 | |||
18 | Miroslaw Dreszer (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-08-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Andreas Egler (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-03-09 | ||||
Marcel Maltritz (until 1998-12-31) | 1978-10-02 | ||||
3 | Christian Prest (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-09-25 | |||
3 | Ronny Roper (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-12-31 | |||
4 | Andrzej Wojcik (until 2000-06-30) | 1963-04-23 | |||
5 | Andreas Lucke (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-09-10 | |||
6 | Jan Sandmann (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-05-03 | |||
9 | Waldemar Koc (until 2002-06-30) | 1968-08-15 | |||
15 | Bodo Schmidt (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-09-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Patrick Ortlieb (until 1999-12-31) | 1976-01-24 | ||||
7 | Jorg Kretzschmar (until 2000-06-30) | 1964-12-09 | |||
13 | David Mydlo (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-04-23 | |||
16 | Dennis Fuchs (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-01-25 | |||
17 | Maik Zentrich (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-06-06 | |||
20 | Dirk Hannemann (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-08-11 | |||
25 | Krzysztof Hetmanski (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-07-15 | |||
28 | Roman Stastka (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-03-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Sebastian Hahnge (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-03-11 | ||||
22 | Ronny Scholze (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-09-17 | |||
26 | Jindrich Dohnal (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-01-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1998-08-29 17:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |