Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerd Warken (from 1999-05-06) (until 1999-06-30) | 1951-03-05 | ||||
Ulrich Sude (from 1998-09-16) (until 1999-05-05) | 1956-04-19 | ||||
Dirk Karkuth (until 1998-09-15) | 1962-01-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Peter Eich (until 2001-06-30) | 1963-06-18 | |||
12 | Harald Ebertz (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-05-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Carsten Birk (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-10-01 | ||||
Jens Gerlach (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-07-03 | ||||
Torsten Wruck (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-07-02 | ||||
Matthias Sellmann (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-01-16 | ||||
Helmut Gabriel (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-10-03 | ||||
Ralf Voigt (from 1998-08-16) (until 1999-06-30) | 1965-12-31 | ||||
Patrick Klyk (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-10-01 | ||||
Joachim Trautmann (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-08-16 | ||||
3 | Anthony Tieku (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-03-16 | |||
16 | Raphael Susic (until 2002-06-30) | 1968-05-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Olivier Caillas (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-12-02 | ||||
Jean-Philippe Sechet (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-07-15 | ||||
Franz Weber (until 1999-12-31) | 1965-05-25 | ||||
Slaven Stanic (until 1999-08-31) | 1974-08-23 | ||||
Charles Haffner (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-01-06 | ||||
Paolo da Palma (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-03-18 | ||||
Juan Carlos Corvalan (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-03-28 | ||||
Patrick Bick (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-03-12 | ||||
Dario Brose (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-01-27 | ||||
Ulrich Braun (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-06-27 | ||||
24 | Anatoli Muschinka (from 1999-01-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-08-19 | |||
26 | Stephen Musa (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-09-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Michael Petri (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-11-23 | ||||
Branko Zibert (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-07-14 | ||||
Taifour Diane (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-11-01 | ||||
8 | Sambo Choji (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-03-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1998-08-28 18:00 |
1 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |