Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwart | |||||
Romuald Peiser (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-08-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Kleine (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-12-28 | ||||
Nico Reckert (until 2002-06-20) | 1981-09-09 | ||||
Carsten Baumann (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-07-28 | ||||
Peter Lerant (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-01-30 | ||||
Konrad Czarnetzki (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-11-15 | ||||
Boris Zivkovic (until 1998-12-31) | 1975-11-15 | ||||
Klaudiusz Gawol (until 1998-11-10) | 1977-09-30 | ||||
Marc Spanier (until 1998-08-31) | 1973-06-15 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Huzeyfe Dogan (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-01-01 | ||||
Thorsten Wittek (until 2001-12-31) | 1976-12-31 | ||||
Andre van der Zander (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-10-24 | ||||
Simon Fahner (until 2000-06-30) | 1979-04-21 | ||||
Christoph Chylla (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-05-06 | ||||
Ergin Yucetas (until 1999-12-31) | 1978-12-25 | ||||
Andre Gumprecht (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-12-26 | ||||
Andreas Gensler (until 1999-06-30) | 1979-08-13 | ||||
Abu Njie (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-10-13 | ||||
Andreas Voss (until 1998-12-31) | 1979-02-27 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Markus Daun (until 2001-12-31) | 1980-09-10 | ||||
Ersin Demir (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-12-08 | ||||
Marcel Podszus (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-08-20 | ||||
Delain Sasa (from 1999-01-01) (until 1999-12-31) | 1978-03-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1998-08-29 15:30 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |