Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Michael Stahl (until 2002-06-30) | 1959-12-09 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Michael Skibbe (until 2000-02-07) | 1965-08-04 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Uwe Neuhaus (until 2004-06-30) | 1959-11-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jens Lehmann (from 1999-01-01) (until 2003-07-22) | 1969-11-10 | |||
1 | Stefan Klos (until 1998-12-31) | 1971-08-16 | |||
12 | Wolfgang de Beer (until 2001-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Julio Cesar (from 1998-11-20) (until 1998-12-31) | 1963-03-08 | ||||
3 | Rene Schneider (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-02-01 | |||
5 | Jurgen Kohler (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-10-06 | |||
7 | Stefan Reuter (until 2004-06-30) | 1966-10-16 | |||
15 | Alfred Nijhuis (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-03-23 | |||
17 | Dede (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-04-18 | |||
19 | Thomas Hengen (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-09-22 | |||
27 | Wolfgang Feiersinger (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-01-30 | |||
32 | Manfred Binz (until 1999-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | |||
33 | Karsten Baumann (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-10-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Knut Reinhardt (until 1998-12-31) | 1968-04-27 | |||
4 | Miroslav Stevic (from 1999-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-01-07 | |||
4 | Steffen Freund (until 1999-01-08) | 1970-01-19 | |||
8 | Christian Nerlinger (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-03-21 | |||
10 | Andreas Moller (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-09-02 | |||
18 | Lars Ricken (until 2007-12-31) | 1976-07-10 | |||
20 | Thomas Hassler (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-05-30 | |||
26 | Frank Riethmann (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-12-09 | |||
29 | Wladimir But (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-09-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Scott Booth (until 1998-11-13) | 1971-12-16 | ||||
9 | Stephane Chapuisat (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-06-28 | |||
11 | Heiko Herrlich (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-12-03 | |||
13 | Bashiru Gambo (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-09-24 | |||
14 | Sergej Barbarez (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-09-17 | |||
21 | Christian Timm (until 1999-06-30) | 1979-02-27 | |||
22 | Ibrahim Tanko (until 2001-03-31) | 1977-07-25 | |||
30 | Bachirou Salou (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-09-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1998-08-28 18:00 |
1 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1998-09-23 20:30 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1998-10-27 19:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |