Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Toni Schumacher (until 1999-12-15) | 1954-03-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Attila Hajdu (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-04-13 | |||
23 | Andreas Wessels (until 1999-06-30) | 1964-07-06 | |||
25 | Tomasz Bobel (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-12-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Hans-Jorg Schneider (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-01-22 | ||||
Hans Sarpei (from 1999-01-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-06-28 | ||||
Marc Spanier (from 1998-09-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-06-15 | ||||
Markus Schuler (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-08-01 | ||||
Harutjun Wardanjan (from 1998-12-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-12-05 | ||||
Markus Kranz (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-08-04 | ||||
Oliver Westerbeek (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-02-08 | ||||
Nico Niedziella (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-05-31 | ||||
2 | Attila Dragoner (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-11-15 | |||
18 | Matthias Mink (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-07-31 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Adam Cichon (until 2002-12-31) | 1975-10-20 | ||||
Hajrudin Catic (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-03-23 | ||||
Rainer Schutterle (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-03-21 | ||||
Olaf Renn (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-10-12 | ||||
Ales Turk (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-07-15 | ||||
Heiko Scholz (until 1998-11-16) | 1966-01-07 | ||||
3 | Marco Zernicke (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-12-05 | |||
20 | Ivica Grlic (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-08-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Toralf Konetzke (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-12-10 | ||||
Thomas Brdaric (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-01-23 | ||||
Festus Agu (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-03-13 | ||||
Mikhail Zaritski (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-01-03 | ||||
13 | Mac Younga-Mouhani (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-08-01 | |||
15 | Jovan Kirovski (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-03-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1998-08-30 21:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |