Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Peter Gadinger (until 2012-03-27) | 1956-07-06 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Rainer Ulrich (from 1998-08-26) (until 1999-10-15) | 1949-06-04 | ||||
Jorg Berger (until 1998-08-26) | 1944-10-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Simon Jentzsch (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-05-04 | |||
21 | Holger Gehrke (until 1999-06-30) | 1960-08-22 | |||
25 | Martin Fischer (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-12-17 | |||
27 | Thomas Hillenbrand (until 2000-06-30) | 1979-10-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Srdjan Mladinic (from 1998-08-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-08-26 | ||||
2 | Thomas Ritter (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-10-10 | |||
3 | Burkhard Reich (until 1999-06-30) | 1964-12-01 | |||
4 | Christian Kritzer (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-02-09 | |||
4 | Raphael Krauss (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-06-25 | |||
5 | Michael Molata (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-02-10 | |||
6 | Guido Buchwald (until 1999-06-30) | 1961-01-24 | |||
17 | Gunther Metz (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-08-08 | |||
23 | Michael Wittwer (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-02-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Rainer Scharinger (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-03-04 | ||||
Andreas Zeyer (until 1998-12-31) | 1968-06-09 | ||||
7 | Marc Kienle (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-10-22 | |||
10 | Marc Arnold (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-09-19 | |||
10 | Martin Vazquez (until 1999-06-30) | 1965-09-25 | |||
12 | Danny Schwarz (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-05-11 | |||
13 | Jens Baumer (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-08-09 | |||
16 | Gunther Schepens (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-05-04 | |||
19 | Darko Jozinovic (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-08-15 | |||
24 | Timo Haas (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-02-08 | |||
25 | Jochen Horner (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-05-18 | |||
26 | Christian Fahrmann (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-10-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Christian Stumpf (until 1998-12-31) | 1966-12-24 | ||||
11 | Christian Wuck (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-06-09 | |||
11 | Radoslaw Gilewicz (until 1998-12-31) | 1971-05-08 | |||
14 | Rainer Krieg (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-02-02 | |||
15 | Rolf-Christel Guie-Mien (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-10-28 | |||
22 | Sven Eller (until 1999-06-30) | 1979-09-24 | |||
24 | Stefan Meissner (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-03-08 | |||
33 | David Zitelli (until 1998-12-31) | 1968-10-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1998-08-28 18:00 |
3 : 4 |
Schema Compare |