Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ernst Middendorp (from 1999-03-25) (until 1999-06-30) | 1958-10-28 | ||||
Henk ten Cate (from 1998-09-30) (until 1999-03-24) | 1954-12-09 | ||||
Jurgen Gelsdorf (until 1998-09-29) | 1953-01-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Achim Hollerieth (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-09-24 | |||
23 | Daniel Eschbach (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-10-05 | |||
26 | Christian Vander (until 2000-06-30) | 1980-10-24 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Robert Nikolic (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-08-01 | |||
4 | Zoran Tomcic (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-02-26 | |||
5 | Jurgen Radschuweit (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-12-04 | |||
6 | Uwe Grauer (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-01-01 | |||
17 | Miroslav Janota (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-10-12 | |||
17 | Guido Schmitz (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-04-02 | |||
20 | Petar Kuschew (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-01-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Almedin Civa (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-04-27 | |||
7 | Robbie Middleby (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-08-09 | |||
10 | Erwin Bradasch (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-01-08 | |||
10 | Daniel Smejkal (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-08-28 | |||
11 | Markus von Ahlen (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-01-01 | |||
12 | Mario Nacev (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-09-28 | |||
13 | Lars Muller (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-03-22 | |||
14 | Tomasz Kakala (until 1998-12-31) | 1975-01-18 | |||
15 | Jorg Scherbe (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-10-19 | |||
19 | Heinz Vossen (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-07-08 | |||
22 | Michael Lorenz (until 1999-06-30) | 1979-01-11 | |||
24 | Sebastian Kaul (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-10-17 | |||
25 | Andreas Passerschroer (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-09-20 | |||
27 | Fuad Sasivarevic (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-08-14 | |||
28 | Michael Husing (until 1999-06-30) | 1980-10-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Giancarlo Fiore (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-07-02 | |||
8 | Dirk van der Ven (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-03-01 | |||
9 | John van Buskirk (until 1998-12-31) | 1972-04-13 | |||
15 | Sven Schuchardt (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-04-27 | |||
16 | Miroslaw Spizak (until 1999-06-30) | 1979-01-13 | |||
18 | Hans van de Haar (from 1998-10-16) (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-02-01 | |||
20 | Delain Sasa (until 1998-12-31) | 1978-03-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1998-08-29 17:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1998-09-23 19:30 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1998-11-03 14:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |