Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ingo Peter (until 2003-06-30) | 1951-10-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Kellermann (until 2000-12-31) | 1968-09-24 | ||||
Michal Balaz (until 1999-12-31) | 1970-08-28 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Afrim Kuci (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-05-19 | ||||
Maik Wolf (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-01-23 | ||||
Thomas Scherzer (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-07-27 | ||||
Vladimir Hyza (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-09-11 | ||||
19 | Frank Germann (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-08-26 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Zorislav Jonjic (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-12-01 | ||||
Uwe Klein (until 2000-12-31) | 1970-01-11 | ||||
Darius Scholtysik (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-08-04 | ||||
Jurgen Margref (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-01-06 | ||||
Dieter Schonberger (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-11-15 | ||||
Dennis Frey (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-12-09 | ||||
Andreas Kramer (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-08-21 | ||||
Rouven Brandt (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-07-23 | ||||
Olivier Niere (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-05-12 | ||||
8 | Asif Saric (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-01-15 | |||
10 | Romas Cirba (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-03-04 | |||
18 | Andreas Nauroth (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-02-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Raffael Tonello (until 2000-12-31) | 1974-06-14 | ||||
Miroslav Ziga (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-09-04 | ||||
Oleh Holowan (until 1998-08-31) | 1971-09-21 | ||||
23 | Martin Willmann (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-11-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1998-08-29 15:30 |
3 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1998-09-23 16:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1998-11-03 14:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1998-12-02 13:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |