Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Vollmer (from 1999-05-17) (until 1999-06-30) | 1962-07-05 | ||||
Paul Linz (until 1999-05-17) | 1956-01-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Thomas Walter (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-03-03 | |||
25 | Bernd Klaus (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-02-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Dirk Wullbier (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-07-29 | |||
4 | Ralf Strogies (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-09-18 | |||
5 | Darko Ramovs (until 2000-12-31) | 1973-04-07 | |||
6 | Alexander Malchow (until 1999-12-31) | 1969-09-11 | |||
15 | Achim Pfuderer (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-11-29 | |||
19 | Michael Kummerle (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-04-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Nico Kemmler (from 1999-01-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-09-22 | ||||
3 | Stefan Minkwitz (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-06-01 | |||
7 | Carsten Marell (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-09-08 | |||
10 | Adnan Kevric (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-05-02 | |||
13 | Niko Chatzis (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-05-02 | |||
16 | Zoltan Sebescen (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-10-01 | |||
17 | Torsten Raspe (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-08-01 | |||
21 | Bernd Santl (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-01-08 | |||
22 | Cristian Fiel (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-03-12 | |||
22 | Mourad Bounoua (until 1998-12-31) | 1972-07-30 | |||
26 | Jago Maric (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-02-03 | |||
27 | Alessandro Di Martile (until 1999-06-30) | 1979-10-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Markus Sailer (until 1999-12-31) | 1968-04-26 | |||
9 | Eberhard Carl (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-05-13 | |||
11 | Danny Winkler (until 1999-12-31) | 1973-08-16 | |||
12 | Joseph Aziz (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-01-07 | |||
14 | Tomislav Maric (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-01-28 | |||
18 | Giuseppe Carnevale (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-06-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1998-08-29 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1998-09-22 18:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |