Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jochen Rucker (until 2005-06-30) | 1944-12-30 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Rangnick (from 1999-05-03) (until 2001-02-23) | 1958-06-29 | ||||
Rainer Adrion (from 1999-01-01) (until 1999-05-03) | 1953-12-10 | ||||
Wolfgang Rolff (from 1998-12-01) (until 1998-12-31) | 1959-12-26 | ||||
Winfried Schafer (until 1998-11-30) | 1950-01-10 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Rolff (until 1998-11-30) | 1959-12-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Franz Wohlfahrt (until 2000-06-30) | 1964-07-01 | |||
25 | Marc Ziegler (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-06-13 | |||
28 | Eberhard Trautner (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-02-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Kai Oswald (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-11-29 | ||||
2 | Martin Spanring (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-10-14 | |||
4 | Thomas Berthold (until 2001-01-16) | 1964-11-12 | |||
5 | Frank Verlaat (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-03-05 | |||
12 | Jens Keller (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-11-24 | |||
14 | Thomas Schneider (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-11-24 | |||
15 | Mitko Stojkovski (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-12-18 | |||
21 | Jochen Endress (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-11-03 | |||
29 | Thomas Kies (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-10-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Thorsten Legat (until 1999-12-31) | 1968-11-07 | |||
7 | Kristijan Dordevic (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-01-06 | |||
8 | Michael Zeyer (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-06-09 | |||
10 | Krassimir Balakow (until 2003-06-30) | 1966-03-29 | |||
16 | Bradley Carnell (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-01-21 | |||
17 | Timo Rost (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-08-29 | |||
18 | Pablo Thiam (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-01-03 | |||
20 | Zvonimir Soldo (until 2006-06-30) | 1967-11-02 | |||
22 | Krisztian Lisztes (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-07-02 | |||
23 | Gerhard Poschner (until 1998-12-31) | 1969-09-23 | |||
33 | Roberto Pinto (from 1999-04-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-08-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Alexander Blessin (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-05-28 | ||||
9 | Sreto Ristic (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-02-07 | |||
11 | Fredi Bobic (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-10-30 | |||
13 | Sasa Markovic (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-07-19 | |||
23 | Ahmed Hosny (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-07-11 | |||
26 | Nico Frommer (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-04-08 | |||
27 | Jonathan Akpoborie (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-10-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1998-08-29 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1998-09-22 19:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1998-10-27 19:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1998-12-01 19:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |