Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ewald Lienen (until 2002-01-27) | 1953-11-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Jan Kocian (until 2002-06-30) | 1958-03-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ronny Teuber (from 2000-01-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-09-01 | ||||
1 | Markus Proll (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-08-28 | |||
16 | Sebastian Selke (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-02-22 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Carsten Cullmann (until 2007-06-30) | 1976-03-05 | |||
4 | Moses Sichone (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-05-31 | |||
5 | Spasoje Bulajic (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-11-24 | |||
13 | Janosch Dziwior (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-09-19 | |||
20 | Thomas Cichon (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-07-09 | |||
26 | Alexander Voigt (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-04-13 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Markus Bahr (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-09-10 | |||
6 | Pascal Ojigwe (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-12-11 | |||
7 | Ralf Hauptmann (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-09-20 | |||
10 | Claus-Dieter Wollitz (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-07-19 | |||
15 | Christian Springer (until 2006-06-30) | 1971-07-15 | |||
17 | Marcel Gebhardt (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-09-15 | |||
24 | Michael Rosele (until 2000-09-30) | 1974-10-07 | |||
25 | Markus Dworrak (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-01-23 | |||
30 | Dirk Lottner (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-03-04 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Joseph Londji (until 2000-06-30) | 1980-04-19 | ||||
8 | Matthias Scherz (until 2009-06-30) | 1971-12-14 | |||
9 | Georgi Donkow (until 2002-03-29) | 1970-06-02 | |||
11 | Khodadad Azizi (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-06-22 | |||
18 | Markus Kurth (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-07-30 | |||
22 | Stephan Glaser (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-03-11 | |||
23 | Christian Timm (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-02-27 | |||
24 | Ralph Hasenhuttl (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-08-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1999-08-07 15:30 |
1 : 7 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1999-10-12 20:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1999-11-30 19:30 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |