Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Stephan Kuhnert (until 2014-06-30) | 1960-09-07 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Dirk Karkuth (from 2000-04-18) (until 2000-06-30) | 1962-01-09 | ||||
Wolfgang Frank (until 2000-04-17) | 1951-02-21 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dirk Karkuth (until 2000-04-17) | 1962-01-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Dimo Wache (until 2010-06-30) | 1973-11-01 | |||
23 | Holger Bernhardt (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-11-24 | |||
30 | Herbert Ilsanker (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-05-24 | |||
36 | Martin Wagner (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-07-23 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Dennis Probst (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-10-11 | ||||
4 | Jurgen Klopp (until 2001-02-27) | 1967-06-16 | |||
5 | Peter Neustadter (until 2004-12-31) | 1966-02-16 | |||
6 | Kristian Zedi (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-08-31 | |||
6 | Robert Nikolic (until 1999-09-30) | 1968-08-01 | |||
20 | Helgi Kolvidsson (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-09-13 | |||
28 | Tony Sekulic (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-10-30 | |||
34 | Manuel Friedrich (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-09-13 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Roland Nagy (until 1999-12-31) | 1971-06-12 | ||||
2 | Thorsten Nehrbauer (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-01-12 | |||
2 | Michael Sauer (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-09-07 | |||
3 | Sergik Teymourian (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-05-29 | |||
8 | Torsten Lieberknecht (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-08-01 | |||
10 | Sirous Dinmohammadi (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-10-07 | |||
11 | Christian Hock (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-04-11 | |||
12 | Steffen Herzberger (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-09-21 | |||
14 | Jurgen Kramny (until 2005-06-30) | 1971-10-18 | |||
15 | Adrian Spyrka (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-08-01 | |||
17 | Mark Schierenberg (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-08-01 | |||
24 | Sandro Schwarz (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-10-17 | |||
26 | Robert Ratkowski (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-08-03 | |||
28 | Vjekoslav Skrinjar (from 2000-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-06-02 | |||
31 | Neil Murray (until 2000-12-31) | 1973-02-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Emil Kostadinow (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-08-12 | ||||
7 | Sven Demandt (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-02-13 | |||
9 | Ermin Melunovic (from 2000-01-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-05-18 | |||
16 | Stipan Jakic (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-05-03 | |||
19 | Gustav Policella (until 2000-10-10) | 1975-09-14 | |||
25 | Machado (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-04-25 | |||
27 | Michael Thurk (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-05-28 | |||
32 | Mahir Sahin (until 2000-06-30) | 1979-11-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1999-08-06 18:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1999-10-13 19:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1999-11-30 19:30 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1999-12-22 19:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |