Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Felix Magath (from 1999-12-27) (until 2001-01-29) | 1953-07-26 | ||||
Jorg Berger (until 1999-12-19) | 1944-10-13 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Frank Engel (until 2000-06-30) | 1951-02-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oka Nikolov (until 2013-06-30) | 1974-05-25 | |||
12 | Dirk Heinen (from 2000-01-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-12-03 | |||
23 | Sven Schmitt (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-12-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Torsten Kracht (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-10-04 | |||
3 | Donald Agu (until 1999-12-31) | 1975-12-12 | |||
4 | Jens Rasiejewski (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-01-01 | |||
5 | Petar Chubtschew (until 2001-06-30) | 1964-02-26 | |||
13 | Erol Bulut (until 1999-12-31) | 1975-01-30 | |||
14 | Uwe Schneider (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-08-28 | |||
18 | Alexander Kutschera (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-03-21 | |||
20 | Uwe Bindewald (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-08-13 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tibor Dombi (until 2000-03-31) | 1973-11-11 | ||||
3 | Marco Gebhardt (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-10-07 | |||
6 | Thomas Zampach (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-12-27 | |||
7 | Thomas Sobotzik (from 1999-12-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-10-16 | |||
8 | Ralf Weber (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-05-31 | |||
10 | Horst Heldt (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-12-09 | |||
16 | Olaf Janssen (until 2000-04-16) | 1966-10-08 | |||
19 | Patrick Falk (until 2000-06-30) | 1980-02-08 | |||
24 | Alexander Schur (until 2006-06-30) | 1971-07-23 | |||
25 | Alexander Rosen (until 2000-12-31) | 1979-04-10 | |||
25 | Rowan Hendricks (until 2000-06-30) | 1979-11-15 | |||
26 | Giuseppe Gemiti (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-05-03 | |||
28 | Albert Streit (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-03-28 | |||
29 | Stefan Zinnow (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-05-28 | |||
33 | Michael Mutzel (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-09-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Jan Age Fjortoft (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-01-10 | |||
11 | Bachirou Salou (until 2000-12-31) | 1970-09-15 | |||
15 | Rolf-Christel Guie-Mien (until 2003-01-02) | 1977-10-28 | |||
17 | Thomas Reichenberger (from 2000-01-01) (until 2001-12-31) | 1974-10-14 | |||
21 | Chen Yang (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-01-17 | |||
30 | Christoph Westerthaler (until 2000-01-16) | 1965-01-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1999-08-08 14:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1999-10-12 20:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |