Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dietmar Demuth (from 2000-03-15) (until 2002-08-20) | 1955-01-14 | ||||
Willi Reimann (until 2000-03-14) | 1949-12-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Klaus Thomforde (until 2000-06-30) | 1962-12-01 | |||
23 | Carsten Wehlmann (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-06-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Andre Trulsen (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-05-28 | |||
8 | Henning Burger (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-12-16 | |||
8 | Stephan Hanke (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-10-19 | |||
12 | Markus Ahlf (until 2001-06-30) | 1977-11-28 | |||
13 | Jean Tsoumou-Madza (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-01-31 | |||
19 | Piotr Staczek (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-09-13 | |||
21 | Holger Stanislawski (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-09-26 | |||
26 | Deniz Baris (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-07-02 | |||
27 | Steffen Karl (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-02-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Christian Rahn (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-06-15 | |||
3 | Dirk Wolf (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-08-04 | |||
4 | Thomas Puschmann (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-03-28 | |||
6 | Markus Lotter (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-09-28 | |||
7 | Holger Wehlage (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-07-03 | |||
7 | Fabian Gerber (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-11-28 | |||
10 | Andrij Polunin (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-03-05 | |||
15 | Zlatan Bajramovic (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-08-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Marcus Marin (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-12-13 | |||
11 | Marek Trejgis (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-03-04 | |||
16 | Miguel Pereira (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-08-23 | |||
17 | Ivan Klasnic (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-01-29 | |||
18 | Cem Karaca (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-05-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1999-08-08 14:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1999-10-12 19:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |