Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Peter Gadinger (until 2012-03-27) | 1956-07-06 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Marco Pezzaiuoli (from 2000-04-20) (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-11-16 | ||||
Joachim Low (from 1999-10-28) (until 2000-04-19) | 1960-02-03 | ||||
Guido Buchwald (from 1999-10-16) (until 1999-10-27) | 1961-01-24 | ||||
Rainer Ulrich (until 1999-10-15) | 1949-06-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Simon Jentzsch (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-05-04 | |||
22 | Thomas Walter (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-03-03 | |||
25 | Martin Fischer (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-12-17 | |||
27 | Thomas Hillenbrand (until 2000-06-30) | 1979-10-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Vragel da Silva (from 2000-01-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-03-29 | ||||
Marcel Rapp (until 2000-06-30) | 1979-04-16 | ||||
Erik Edman (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-11-11 | ||||
Srdjan Mladinic (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-08-26 | ||||
2 | Moudachirou Amadou (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-12-11 | |||
3 | Marco Grimm (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-06-16 | |||
4 | Christian Kritzer (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-02-09 | |||
5 | Michael Zepek (until 2001-06-30) | 1981-01-19 | |||
6 | Michael Molata (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-02-10 | |||
8 | Daniel Addo (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-11-06 | |||
23 | Michael Wittwer (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-02-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Alessandro Caruso (until 2000-06-30) | 1980-07-04 | ||||
5 | Martin Braun (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-11-18 | |||
7 | Marc Kienle (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-10-22 | |||
10 | Marc Arnold (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-09-19 | |||
11 | Manfred Bender (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-05-24 | |||
12 | Douglas Sequeira (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-08-23 | |||
13 | Jens Baumer (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-08-09 | |||
15 | Christian Fahrmann (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-10-05 | |||
19 | Darko Jozinovic (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-08-15 | |||
24 | Rainer Schutterle (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-03-21 | |||
35 | Miran Pavlin (from 1999-09-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-10-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Patrick De Napoli (from 2000-01-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-11-17 | ||||
Minor Diaz (until 2000-06-30) | 1980-12-26 | ||||
9 | Rainer Krieg (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-02-02 | |||
12 | Aydin Cetin (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-05-21 | |||
14 | Stefan Meissner (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-03-08 | |||
16 | Carsten Lakies (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-01-08 | |||
17 | Jens Paeslack (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-02-25 | |||
18 | Benjamin Auer (until 2000-06-30) | 1981-01-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1999-08-06 19:00 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |