Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Neururer (from 1999-10-25) (until 2000-08-06) | 1955-04-26 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Boysen (until 1999-10-24) | 1957-05-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Goran Curko (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-08-21 | ||||
Thorsten Rohrbach (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-09-20 | ||||
1 | Rene Keffel (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-01-14 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Dietmar Roth (until 2001-06-30) | 1963-09-16 | ||||
Michael Kopper (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-11-17 | ||||
Dubravko Kolinger (until 2000-10-31) | 1975-11-29 | ||||
Steven Kessler (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-12-13 | ||||
3 | Manfred Binz (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | |||
5 | Lars Meyer (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-05-14 | |||
5 | Stefan Dolzer (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-07-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gunther Maier (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-08-26 | ||||
Stefan Ertl (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-04-21 | ||||
Tom Stohn (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-12-21 | ||||
Daniel Mingrone (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-07-23 | ||||
Zeno Bundea (from 1999-10-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-10-04 | ||||
Kai-Uwe Giersch (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-04-08 | ||||
Michael Hartmann (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-12-06 | ||||
Bernd Gramminger (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-07-08 | ||||
2 | Matthias Dworschak (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-04-08 | |||
6 | Patrick Dama (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-04-05 | |||
7 | Lars Schmidt (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-09-13 | |||
10 | Oliver Speth (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-08-03 | |||
11 | Stefan Simon (until 2000-12-31) | 1969-06-18 | |||
14 | Necip Incesu (until 1999-12-31) | 1978-01-17 | |||
15 | Florian Sohler (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-04-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Ion Vladoiu (from 1999-12-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-11-05 | ||||
Holger Gaissmayer (from 2000-01-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-07-02 | ||||
Oliver Roth (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-01-30 | ||||
Aleksandar Jovic (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-04-13 | ||||
Bing Li (from 2000-01-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-03-16 | ||||
Giuseppe Messinese (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-11-23 | ||||
Dirk Vollmar (until 1999-12-31) | 1972-04-04 | ||||
9 | Matthias Becker (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-04-19 | |||
20 | Marco Grevelhorster (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-04-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1999-08-01 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-08-07 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |