Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Benno Mohlmann (until 2000-10-21) | 1954-08-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Paul Hesselbach (until 2001-09-30) | 1951-07-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ronny Teuber (until 1999-12-31) | 1965-09-01 | ||||
1 | Gunther Reichold (until 2003-06-30) | 1965-06-10 | |||
21 | Mathias Hain (until 2000-10-29) | 1972-12-31 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Martin Meichelbeck (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-11-21 | ||||
Florian Hube (until 2000-06-30) | 1980-09-30 | ||||
Roger Prinzen (until 1999-12-31) | 1969-03-04 | ||||
4 | Oliver Schmidt (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-09-14 | |||
5 | Petr Skarabela (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-11-24 | |||
14 | Domenico Sbordone (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-09-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ingo Walther (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-11-16 | ||||
Henry Onwuzuruike (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-12-26 | ||||
Wladimir Jonkow (until 1999-12-31) | 1973-07-19 | ||||
6 | Mirko Reichel (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-12-02 | |||
10 | Nii Lamptey (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-12-10 | |||
11 | Petr Ruman (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-11-02 | |||
15 | Daniel Felgenhauer (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-05-10 | |||
16 | Mathias Surmann (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-12-19 | |||
20 | Rachid Azzouzi (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-01-10 | |||
22 | Zivojin Juskic (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-12-16 | |||
23 | Christian Hassa (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-10-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Nico Patschinski (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-11-08 | ||||
9 | Frank Turr (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-09-16 | |||
13 | Carsten Klee (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-09-15 | |||
29 | Konstantin Ognjanovic (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-05-05 | |||
30 | Faouzi Rouissi (until 2001-12-31) | 1971-03-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1999-07-31 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-08-07 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1999-10-12 19:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |