Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Armin Veh (until 2001-12-12) | 1961-02-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marco Langner (until 2007-06-30) | 1969-05-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Pfannkuch (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-02-21 | ||||
3 | Torsten Traub (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-09-08 | |||
4 | Joachim Cast (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-03-04 | |||
5 | Sasa Janic (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-05-07 | |||
14 | Donald Agu (from 2000-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-12-12 | |||
15 | Torsten Chmielewski (until 2002-06-30) | 1968-01-21 | |||
22 | Denis Lapaczinski (until 2001-06-30) | 1981-09-26 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Mayer (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-10-17 | ||||
Abiodun Obafemi (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-12-25 | ||||
Frank Kastner (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-11-29 | ||||
6 | Godfried Aduobe (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-10-29 | |||
7 | Robert Hofacker (until 2003-06-30) | 1967-12-22 | |||
8 | Stefan Lexa (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-11-01 | |||
9 | Jan Hoffmann (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-09-01 | |||
10 | Ralf Becker (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-09-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Haris Karamehmedovic (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-04-17 | ||||
Marijo Maric (until 1999-08-31) | 1977-01-12 | ||||
11 | Olivier Djappa (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-11-22 | |||
13 | Milan Kerbr (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-09-06 | |||
16 | Andreas Rill (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-01-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1999-08-06 18:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |