Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Herman Andreev (from 1999-10-09) (until 2002-02-01) | 1966-01-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Oskar Kosche (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-08-18 | ||||
28 | Dirk Heinrichs (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-05-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Heiko Marz (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-07-09 | ||||
Ali Moustapha (from 2000-01-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-11-11 | ||||
Roman Muller (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-06-29 | ||||
Jorg Buder (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-09-24 | ||||
Heiko Bengs (until 1999-12-31) | 1972-12-30 | ||||
4 | Marcus Petsch (until 2002-12-31) | 1966-06-08 | |||
17 | Marco Laaser (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-01-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Guido Block (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-09-08 | ||||
Michael Steiner (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-10-04 | ||||
Stephan Schmidt (until 1999-12-31) | 1976-08-19 | ||||
10 | Davor Krznaric (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-08-22 | |||
21 | Michael Lorenz (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-01-11 | |||
24 | Slawomir Chalaskiewicz (until 2003-06-30) | 1963-11-29 | |||
25 | Almedin Civa (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-04-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Marco Kuntzel (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-01-22 | ||||
Hendryk Lau (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-09-05 | ||||
Richard Slezak (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-04-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1999-08-07 15:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1999-10-12 15:00 |
2 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |