Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Michael Feichtenbeiner (from 2000-05-28) (until 2002-04-24) | 1960-07-09 | ||||
Eckhard Krautzun (from 1999-10-12) (until 2000-05-27) | 1941-01-13 | ||||
Slavko Petrovic (until 1999-10-11) | 1958-08-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Andreas Clauss (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-01-13 | |||
25 | Kai Arras (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-07-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Robert Nikolic (from 1999-10-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-08-01 | ||||
Oliver Wolki (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-12-30 | ||||
Thorsten Becht (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-05-07 | ||||
3 | Tuncay Nadaroglu (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-07-27 | |||
4 | Thomas Schmidt (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-10-26 | |||
5 | Matthias Orum (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-11-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Thomas Born (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-11-28 | ||||
Tim Gutberlet (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-08-23 | ||||
Kristian Sprecakovic (until 1999-12-31) | 1978-06-12 | ||||
6 | Rolf Lang (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-06-12 | |||
12 | Roland Nagy (from 2000-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-06-12 | |||
16 | Oscar Corrochano (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-09-06 | |||
17 | Boris Kolb (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-11-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Steffen Bury (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-06-02 | ||||
Christian Seeberger (until 1999-12-31) | 1972-01-28 | ||||
Mentor Dzemaili (until 1999-12-31) | 1968-07-20 | ||||
9 | Roland Hoop (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-04-04 | |||
11 | David Wagner (from 1999-10-21) (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-10-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1999-07-31 15:30 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |