Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Rapolder (until 2001-11-12) | 1958-05-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Colin Bell (from 2000-04-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1961-08-05 | ||||
Martin Hagele (until 2000-06-30) | 1956-01-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Michael Zoll (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-09-28 | ||||
Stephan Straub (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-01-25 | ||||
1 | Marius Todericiu (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-06-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Sven Kegel (until 2001-06-30) | 1981-03-24 | ||||
Thomas Herz (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-02-10 | ||||
Vilmos Sebok (from 2000-01-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-06-13 | ||||
Maik Unfricht (until 2000-06-30) | 1979-11-13 | ||||
Reinhold Konig (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-08-07 | ||||
Markus Schmid (until 2000-06-30) | 1979-08-01 | ||||
Jorn Schwinkendorf (until 1999-11-22) | 1971-01-27 | ||||
2 | Lamine Cisse (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-12-12 | |||
3 | Rudiger Rehm (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-11-22 | |||
4 | Mounir Boukadida (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-10-24 | |||
5 | Vilmar Santos Barbosa (until 2003-01-14) | 1968-01-07 | |||
6 | Dariusz Pasieka (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-08-03 | |||
13 | Christian Fickert (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-02-10 | |||
17 | Ronny Ernst (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-05-07 | |||
26 | Raphael Krauss (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-06-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Oda Hamodi (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-06-21 | ||||
Hanno Balitsch (until 2001-06-30) | 1981-01-02 | ||||
Fatmir Vata (from 2000-01-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-09-19 | ||||
Thomas Franck (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-02-24 | ||||
Mallam Yahaya (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-12-31 | ||||
Michael Oelkuch (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-02-05 | ||||
Philipp Eich (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-05-01 | ||||
Cuneyt Kocabicak (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-06-19 | ||||
Kachaber Katscharawa (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-06-19 | ||||
8 | David Montero (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-01-16 | |||
10 | Otto Vincze (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-08-29 | |||
18 | Werner Protzel (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-10-05 | |||
19 | Selim Teber (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-03-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Hamodi Oda (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-06-21 | ||||
Bernhard Weis (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-03-10 | ||||
7 | Ning Zhou (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-04-02 | |||
9 | Jean-Pierre Rubio-Sanchez (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-08-21 | |||
9 | Sascha Licht (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-09-27 | |||
11 | David Wagner (until 1999-10-20) | 1971-10-19 | |||
20 | Laszlo Klausz (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-05-24 | |||
22 | Uwe Wassmer (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-01-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1999-08-07 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1999-10-12 18:00 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1999-12-01 19:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |